CA SB1265 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5105, 5110, 5125, 5145, and 5200 of, and to add Section 5910.1 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1265 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1265 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1265 Wieckowski (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1265 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1265 Wieckowski (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5958.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 6734.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | (Received pursuant to JR 61(b)(14)). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 3). |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4420.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4997.) (May 8). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 4724.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4801 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 5105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5910.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 5930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |