CA SB1263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.2 (commencing with Section 35635) to Division 26.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ocean Protection Council: Statewide Microplastics Strategy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1263 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1263 Portantino Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1263 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6597.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and E.S. & T.M.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4455.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4307.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4787.) (April 24).
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24 in N.R. & W. pending receipt.
2018-04-12SenateRe-referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
2018-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-10SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-02SenateApril 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Coms. on INS. and APPR.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on I., B. & F.I. and APPR.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code2063New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code35635New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback