CA SB1261 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12087.12 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 748.6 of, and to add Section 922.5 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: low-emissions buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1261 Stern et al (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | June 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 3969.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3790.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3517.) (April 26). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3238.) (March 28). |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and N.R. & W. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12087.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 748.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 922.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |