CA SB1260 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Jun 25 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 447
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 51179, 65302.5, 65352, and 66474.02 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 13008 and 13055 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4475, 4476, and 4479 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 4475) of Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, to add Sections 4114.3, 4482, and 4483 to, to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 4495) to Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, to add and repeal Section 4481 of, to repeal Sections 4475.1, 4475.5, 4478, and 4480 of, and to repeal and add Section 4477 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire prevention and protection: prescribed burns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1260 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4811.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4698.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
2018-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W., EQ., and GOV. & F.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback