CA SB1260 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51179, 65302.5, 65352, and 66474.02 of the Government Code, to amend Section 41812 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4475, 4476, 4479, 4480, and 4494 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 4475) of Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, to add Sections 4114.3, and 4483 to, to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 4495) to Chapter 7 of Part 2 of Division 4 of, to repeal Sections 4475.1, 4475.5, and 4478 of, and to repeal and add Section 4477 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Fire prevention and protection: prescribed burns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1260 Jackson Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1260 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1260 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1260 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1260 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6170.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4413.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4307.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4811.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4698.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., EQ., and GOV. & F. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |