CA SB1256 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.6 (commencing with Section 42395) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to waste management.
Title
Waste management: disposable propane cylinders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1256 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1256 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1256 Wieckowski (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1256 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1256 Wieckowski (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 5883.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3824.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3437.) (April 19). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3239.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42395 | New Code | See Bill Text |