CA SB1255 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100504 of the Government Code, relating to health insurance.
Title
Health insurance market: financial assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1255 Hernandez et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1255 Hernandez et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4351.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4307.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4655.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |