CA SB1254 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Hearing: Jun 19 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 4118.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital pharmacies: medication profiles or lists for high-risk patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1254 Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 22).
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23).
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-09SenateApril 9 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-28SenateApril 16 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4118.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback