CA SB1253 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 697, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9, 101, 9002, 9004, 9005, 9014, 9030, 9031, 9033, 9034, 9051, 9082.7, 9094.5, 9604, and 18621 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiative measures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1253 Steinberg (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1253 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1253 Steinberg (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 697, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2014-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4973.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2014-08-27SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2014-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6545.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-08-21AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 6304.) Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-18AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
2014-08-06AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-08-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24).
2014-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2014-06-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2014-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3688.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-05-27SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3713.) (May 23).
2014-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2014-05-05SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-25SenateSet for hearing May 5.
2014-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2014-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2014-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2014-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code18621Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code303.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9002Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9004Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9005Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9014Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9030Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9031Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9033Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9034Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9051Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9082.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9092Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9094.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9604Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code88006Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1253&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140409_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140527_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140617_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140701_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140804_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140818_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140821_amended_asm_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140903_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_bill_20140927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_vote_20140422_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_vote_20140505_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_vote_20140523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_vote_20140529_1102AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_vote_20140624_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_vote_20140814_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_vote_20140827_1138AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1251-1300/sb_1253_vote_20140829_1159AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback