CA SB1250 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1939.18 to the Civil Code, relating to business.
Title
Rental passenger vehicle transactions: fees: toll roads and bridges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1250 Limón (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1250 Limón (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3862.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in TRANS. pending receipt. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and TRANS. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1939.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |