CA SB1249 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 899, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1834.9.5 to the Civil Code, relating to animal testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal testing: cosmetics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1249 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1249 Galgiani et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1249 Galgiani (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 899, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6173.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-29AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-08-29AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2018-08-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 8).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 4409.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4307.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4815.) (April 24).
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1834.9.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback