CA SB1248 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 565, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 10232.1 and 10232.81 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Sections 22005.1, 22005.3, and 22009 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to long-term care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Partnership for Long-Term Care Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1248 Gaines et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1248 Gaines Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1248 Gaines et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 565, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5691.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6516.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and INS.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4337.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4885.) (April 25).
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4746.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and INS.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback