CA SB1246 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5097 of, and to add Section 5105 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax: claims for refund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1246 Gaines (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-06-25AssemblyJune 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-18AssemblyJune 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4333.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-17SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4996.) (May 9).
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2018-05-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback