CA SB1245 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 123641) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 106 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to abortion.
Title
Los Angeles County Abortion Access Safe Haven Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1245 Kamlager et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1245 Kamlager Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1245 Kamlager et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1245 Kamlager Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1245 Kamlager et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5281.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-07-29 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 28). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3924.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3789.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3514.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3349.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123641 | New Code | See Bill Text |