CA SB1245 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100504 of the Government Code, relating to health coverage.
Title
Covered California.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1245 Leyva Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1245 Leyva (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1245 Leyva (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6399.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4220.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4746.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |