CA SB1244 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 789, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 789, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76004 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: dual enrollment: College and Career Access Pathways partnerships.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB1244 Newman (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1244 Newman Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1244 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1244 Newman Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1244 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 789, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5749.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6698.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4181.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3977.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3466.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |