CA SB1244 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 463, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6259 of the Government Code, relating to public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public records: disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1244 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Assembly - SB 1244 Wieckowski Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1244 Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 463, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5263.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6217.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4331.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4997.) (May 8).
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2018-04-18SenateMay 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code6253Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6254.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6259Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback