CA SB1238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 123106 and 123107 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient records: maintenance and storage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1238 Roth (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 26).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 4340.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4240.) (May 22).
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4815.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-09SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4556.) (April 4).
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code123106New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code123107New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback