CA SB1230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 12100.70) and Article 9 (commencing with Section 12100.80) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Sections 12209.8, 17053.58. and 23658 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to economic development.
Title
Community development financial institutions: grant program: income taxation: credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12100.80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12209.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.58. | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23658 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1230 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1230 |