CA SB1228 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 994, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 994, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 680 of, and to add Section 679.12 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: DNA samples.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1228 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1228 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1228 Wiener et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1228 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1228 Wiener et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 994, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5311.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | June 22 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3840.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3789.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 679.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 680 | Amended Code | Citation Text |