CA SB1228 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 792, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 11831.6 and 11831.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholism or drug abuse recovery and treatment services: referrals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1228 Lara Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1228 Lara Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1228 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 792, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6114.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6971.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4455.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4819.) (April 24).
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4746.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11831.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11831.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11977New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1170.06Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback