CA SB1226 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 423, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 423, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6538.5 of the Government Code, relating to joint powers.
Title
Joint powers agreements: zero-emission transportation systems or facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1226 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1226 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lee (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1226 Durazo (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1226 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lee (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1226 Durazo (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 423, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5021.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 5887.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3). |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3828.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3. Page 3521.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 7). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., TRANS., and E.Q. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6538.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |