CA SB122 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the Budget Act of 2017.
Title
Budget Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB122 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1042.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |