CA SB1217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7542, 7564, and 7570 of, and to add Sections 7542.2, 7542.3, 7542.4, 7542.5, 7542.6, 7542.7, 7542.9, 7542.10, 7542.11, and 7542.12 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Private Investigator Act: firearms qualification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1217 Morrell Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1217 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1217 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1217 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1217 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4359.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7542.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7564 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7570 | Amended Code | Citation Text |