CA SB1215 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.3 (commencing with Section 13288) to Division 7 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provision of sewer service: disadvantaged communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1215 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1215 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1215 Hertzberg (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27).
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4351.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4306.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30Senate(Corrected April 30).
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4810.) (April 25).
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4720.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-20SenateApril 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code116680Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116681Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116682Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116683New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code13288New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback