CA SB1213 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 722, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 722, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 242 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public Utilities Commission and State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission: public outreach: community-based organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1213 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1213 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1213 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 722, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2022-07-29 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3647.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3414.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 242 | New Code | See Bill Text |