CA SB1212 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 841, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 841, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 280 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.
Title
"2-1-1" information and referral network.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1212 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1212 Hueso Senate Third Reading By DODD (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1212 Hueso (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1212 Hueso Senate Third Reading By DODD (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1212 Hueso (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 841, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5406.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6093.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 4049.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4006.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3593.) (April 19). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |