CA SB121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100520 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 123451, 123452, 127502, 127503, 128205, 128210, 128230, and 128235 of, and to add Section 123453 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 1370 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 4335.2, 4361.6, 5328, 14005.13, and 14197.2 of, to amend and repeal Sections 14134 and 14134.1 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 15853 of, and to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 14199.70) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Budget Act of 2022: Health Omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB121 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2022-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 275.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |