CA SB1208 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 68115 of the Government Code, relating to courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts, judicial emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1208 JUD. (Jackson) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1208 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1208 JUD. (Jackson) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-24 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-15SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5222.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6109.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-31AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4515.) (April 3).
2018-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code68115Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback