CA SB1207 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - June 20 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - June 20 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 100000, 100002, 100004, 100008, 100012, 100014, 100016, 100032, 100034, 100046, and 100049 of the Government Code, to amend Section 1088.9 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Section 12302.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to retirement savings plans.
Title
CalSavers Retirement Savings Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1207 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | June 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4789.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 352.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100046 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100049 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1088.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12302.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |