CA SB1206 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 884, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 39735 and 39736 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hydrofluorocarbon gases: sale or distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1206 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1206 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1206 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 884, Statutes of 2022.
2022-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2022-08-26 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2022-08-18SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 4898.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2022-08-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2022-08-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 8. Page 5891.) Ordered to the Senate.
2022-08-11AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2022-08-11AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2022-08-04AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2022-08-04AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2022-08-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-08-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3).
2022-06-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 13).
2022-06-07AssemblyJune 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2022-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2022-06-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2022-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2022-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3923.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2022-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-05-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2022-05-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3788.) (May 19).
2022-05-13SenateSet for hearing May 19.
2022-04-18SenateApril 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2022-04-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2022-03-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3239.) (March 28).
2022-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2022-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2022-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2022-02-18SenateFrom printer.
2022-02-17SenateArticle IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
2022-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39735New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code39736Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#91AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#90ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206#89CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB1206

Bill Comments

feedback