CA SB1206 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5849.4, 5849.35, and 5890 of, and to add Section 5849.15 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
No Place Like Home Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1206 De León et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 4459.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | May 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4852.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 17002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5849.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |