CA SB1205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22160 and 22164 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local agency design-build projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code22160Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code22164Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback