CA SB1205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 13146.4 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire protection services: inspections: compliance reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1205 Hill Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1205 Hill Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1205 Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 6070.)
2018-08-29SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5927.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-08-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02Assembly(Received June 29 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(13)).
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-06-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5009.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3).
2018-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code13146.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code592New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback