CA SB1202 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 66023 of the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use: development fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1202 Stone Senate Third Reading By MAYES (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1202 Stone (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6299.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4224.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4995.) (May 9).
2018-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code66006Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code66009New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code66023Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback