CA SB1201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HOUSING rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HOUSING rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8256 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
Homelessness: state programs: Housing First.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HOUSING rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-23 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8256 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1201 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1201 |