CA SB1200 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 19850) to Part 2 of Division 10 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health services grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19850 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1200 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1200 |