CA SB12 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 3.35 (commencing with Section 5833) to Division 5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health services: youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 Beall et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 Beall et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 490.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5833 | New Code | See Bill Text |