CA SB1199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12804 of, and to add Chapter 17 (commencing with Section 8899.80) to Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 2090) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 2 of the Insurance Code, relating to state government.
Title
Commission on Home Hardening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1199 McGuire et al (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3875.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3770.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on INS. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3. Page 3525.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and INS. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8899.80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 2090 | New Code | See Bill Text |