CA SB1195 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1075 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] |
Asm. James Ramos [D] | Asm. Thurston Smith [R] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1195 Grove Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1195 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1195 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5828.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3670.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3516.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1075 | New Code | See Bill Text |