CA SB1193 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2909.5, 2913, 2914, 2914.1, 2914.2, 2915, 2920, 2933, 4001, 4003, 4013, 4035, 4081, 4107, 4110, 4119.1, 4127, 4127.3, 4127.7, 4127.8, 4127.9, 4128.6, 4161, 4180, 4201, 4301, 4302, 4307, 4308, 4312, 4400, 4406, 4800, 4804.5, 4830, 4846.5, 4904, and 4905 of, to add Sections 2934.1, 2988.5, 4034, 4105.5, 4126.9, 4203.5, 4301.1, 4303.1, 4316, 4826.5, 4848.1, and 4853.7 to, and to add Article 7.7 (commencing with Section 4129) to Chapter 9 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 2947 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 13401.5 of the Corporations Code, and to amend Sections 1261.6 and 11164.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1193 Hill Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1193 Hill Senate Third Reading By SALAS (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1193 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1193 Hill Senate Third Reading By SALAS (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1193 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5406.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6086.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4106.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3591.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |