CA SB1192 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11400 of, and to add Sections 11401.5, 11401.6, and 11401.7 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters’, police officers’, or peace officers’ benefit and relief associations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1192 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1192 Bradford (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
2020-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 29 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2020-06-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3678.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3663.) (June 9).
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3540.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2020-05-11SenateSet for hearing May 14 in INS. pending receipt.
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code11400Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code11401.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code11401.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code11401.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback