CA SB1191 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 368.5 of the Penal Code, relating to elder and dependent adult abuse.
Title
Crimes: elder and dependent adult abuse: investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1191 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1191 Hueso Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1191 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1191 Hueso Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1191 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6115.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6982.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4516.) (April 3). |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | March 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 368.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |