CA SB1191 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 368.5 of the Penal Code, relating to elder and dependent adult abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes: elder and dependent adult abuse: investigations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1191 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
2018-05-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4764.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4516.) (April 3).
2018-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-12SenateMarch 20 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code368.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback