CA SB1190 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11546.10 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Department of Technology: California Trust Framework.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3251.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and ED. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11546.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |