CA SB1190 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 24200) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4514 and 5328 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to victim compensation.
Title
Eugenics Sterilization Compensation Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1190 Skinner et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1190 Skinner et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4421.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4305.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4700.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 24200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5328 | Amended Code | Citation Text |