CA SB1188 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 680, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 680, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116760.20, 116760.50, 116761.20, and 116761.65 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Safe Drinking Water State Revolving Fund: financial assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1188 Laird Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1188 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1188 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 680, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5939.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3934.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3787.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3239.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116760.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116760.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116761.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116761.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |