CA SB1188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - April 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 3726.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - April 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 3726.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1454 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Domestic workers: overtime: sleep hours.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-11-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | April 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 3726.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |