CA SB1185 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 12.2 (commencing with Section 15910) of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to underground operations.
Title
Centralized Intelligence Partnership Act: pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1185 Price (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1185 Price (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-02 | Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2012-06-27 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5461.) Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5461.) | |
2012-06-15 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and PUB. S. | |
2012-05-31 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3739.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3592.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-07 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3262.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-17 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-12 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-04-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3120.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-03-22 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15910 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 15923 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |