CA SB1184 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 38757 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: City of Sacramento shared autonomous vehicle pilot project.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1184 Pan (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4231.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 4822.) (April 24). |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 13202.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38757 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |